There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to adjust the boundary of the Barataria Preserve Unit of the Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve in the State of Louisiana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9029)
03/09/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-25.
01/31/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9029)
03/09/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37.
03/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-25.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/31/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S655)
01/31/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S654-655)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/31/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/31/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/09/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-25
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve Boundary Adjustment Act of 2005 - Amends the National Parks and Recreation Act of 1978 to: (1) adjust the boundary of the Barataria Preserve Unit of Jean Lafitte National Historical Park and Preserve in Louisiana by increasing the acreage limitation; and (2) authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire any such additional land, water, and interests in land and water by donation, purchase, transfer from any other federal agency, or exchange.

Requires, with respect to the Bayou aux Carpes Addition and the CIT Tract Addition, any federal land acquired in such Additions to be transferred without consideration to the administrative jurisdiction of the National Park Service. Permits the acquisition of any private land in those Additions only with the owner's consent.

Subjects any federal land in the CIT Tract Addition to any easements that have been agreed to by the Secretary and the Secretary of the Army.

Modifies and/or eliminates certain provisions related to the acquisition of property within the Unit.

Permits hunting, fishing, and trapping within the Unit. (Current law excludes such activities within the core area of the Unit and on certain lands acquired by the Secretary within the Unit.) Continues to provide for the designation of zones where, and established periods when, no hunting, fishing, or trapping shall be permitted except for public safety reasons.