Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/18/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/13/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/21/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/25/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/13/2006