Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 12/12/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/13/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/13/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 12/13/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/13/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 12/13/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/14/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/14/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/14/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/15/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/15/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/16/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/16/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/16/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/16/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/16/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/16/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/16/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/16/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/16/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/16/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/16/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/16/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 12/16/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/16/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/16/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 12/16/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/17/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/18/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 12/18/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 12/18/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/18/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/19/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 12/19/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/19/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 12/19/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/19/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/19/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/19/2005