Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/25/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/25/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/25/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/25/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/15/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/12/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/17/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/17/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/25/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/06/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/08/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/27/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/11/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/11/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/11/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/11/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/13/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/14/2005