Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/01/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/07/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/02/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/09/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/20/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/26/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/23/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/27/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/27/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/30/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/26/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/29/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/08/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/06/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/18/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/12/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/20/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/27/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/13/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/26/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/24/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 08/03/2006