There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Valles Caldera Preservation Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Valles Caldera Preservation Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Valles Caldera Preservation Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Valles Caldera Preservation Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Valles Caldera Preservation Act to improve the preservation of the Valles Caldera, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2005Became Public Law No: 109-132. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2005Signed by President.
12/12/2005Presented to President.
12/06/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11045-11046)
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9019-9020)
02/23/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 without amendment. With written report No. 109-10.
01/31/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2005Became Public Law No: 109-132. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2005Signed by President.
12/12/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2005-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2005-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11045-11046)
12/06/2005-2:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 212.
12/06/2005-2:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11045-11046)
12/06/2005-2:31pmHouseMr. Radanovich moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/01/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9019-9020)
02/23/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 21.
02/23/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 without amendment. With written report No. 109-10.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/31/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S658)
01/31/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S657-658)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/31/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/31/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
02/23/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-10
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/01/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.212.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.212. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-132 (12/20/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Valles Caldera Preservation Act of 2005 - Amends the Valles Caldera Preservation Act to require the Secretary of Agriculture to negotiate a price for buying the remaining mineral interests of the Valles Caldera Preserve in New Mexico. Directs that any difference between the sum estimated to be just compensation by the Secretary and the amount awarded be paid from the permanent judgment appropriation.

Requires the Trust to determine the character of, and the necessity for, any obligations and expenditures of the Trust and the manner in which obligations and expenditures shall be incurred, allowed, and paid.

Grants authority to use monies received from claims, judgments, or settlements arising from activities occurring on the Baca Ranch or the Preserve after October 27, 1999, for specified purposes.

Provides for the rate of compensation of the chairperson of the Trust.

Authorizes the Trust to dispose of forage, forest products, or marketable renewable resources as part of its resource management authority.

Directs the Secretary to develop a plan to carry out fire preparedness, suppression, and emergency rehabilitation services on the Preserve. Authorizes the Secretary to provide presuppression and non-emergency rehabilitation and restoration services for the Trust, to the extent generally authorized at other National Forest System units, at any time on a reimbursable basis.