Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 12/16/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 12/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/25/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/15/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/16/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/17/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/19/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/06/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/28/2006