Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/21/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 12/21/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/06/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/06/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/06/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/07/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/09/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/01/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/13/2006