Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/31/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/16/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/16/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/01/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/01/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/01/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/02/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/02/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/09/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/09/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/16/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/27/2006