Text: S.2167 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-160 (12/30/2005)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 160]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ160.109]

[[Page 119 STAT. 2957]]

Public Law 109-160
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To amend the USA PATRIOT ACT to extend the sunset of certain provisions 
 of that Act and the lone wolf provision of the Intelligence Reform and 
   Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to July 1, 2006. <<NOTE: Dec. 30, 
                          2005 -  [S. 2167]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF SUNSET OF CERTAIN PROVISIONS OF THE USA PATRIOT 
            ACT AND THE LONE WOLF PROVISION OF THE INTELLIGENCE REFORM 
            AND TERRORISM PREVENTION ACT OF 2004.

    Section 224(a) of the Uniting and Strengthening America by Providing 
Appropriate Tools Required to Intercept and Obstruct Terrorism (USA 
PATRIOT ACT) Act of 2001 (18 U.S.C. 2510 note) is amended by striking 
``December 31, 2005'' and inserting ``February 3, 2006''.

    Approved December 30, 2005.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2167 (H.R. 4647):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 151 (2005):
            Dec. 21, considered and passed Senate.
            Dec. 22, considered and passed House, amended. Senate 
                concurred in House amendment.

                                  <all>