Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/31/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/03/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/09/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/09/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/04/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/06/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/20/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/13/2005