Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/26/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/30/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/30/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/30/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/30/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/30/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 01/30/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/30/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/30/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/31/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/14/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/14/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/28/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/28/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/06/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/06/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/15/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/16/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/29/2006