Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/26/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/27/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/30/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/31/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/31/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 01/31/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/31/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/01/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/01/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/02/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/07/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/07/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/14/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/14/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/28/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/28/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 03/07/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/14/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/16/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/16/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/27/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/03/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/06/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/07/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/24/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/24/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/26/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/27/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/27/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/03/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/03/2006