Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/01/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/01/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/02/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/02/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/02/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/06/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/06/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/06/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/07/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/28/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/02/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/18/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/18/2006