There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to undertake a program to reduce the risks from and mitigate the effects of avalanches on recreational users of public land.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to undertake a program to reduce the risks from and mitigate the effects of avalanches on recreational users of public land.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9020-9021)
02/23/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-11.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/27/2006HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health
08/03/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9020-9021)
02/23/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
02/23/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-11.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/01/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S741)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/01/2005

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
02/23/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-11
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/02/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/02/2005 Referred to
07/27/2006 Hearings by
House Agriculture07/27/2005 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Dairy, Nutrition, and Forestry08/03/2005 Referred to
House Government Reform07/27/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.225. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on February 23, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to establish an avalanche protection program to: (1) provide early identification of the potential for avalanches that could endanger the safety of recreational users of public land and visitors to units of the National Park System (NPS); and (2) reduce the risks and mitigate the effects of avalanches on visitors, recreational users, neighboring communities, and transportation corridors.

Requires the Secretary and the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) use the resources of the National Avalanche Center of the Forest Service to carry out this Act; and (2) establish an advisory committee to assist in the development and implementation of the program.

Directs such Secretaries and the Secretary of the Army to establish a central depository for weapons, ammunition, and parts for avalanche control purposes, including an inventory that can be made available to federal and non-federal entities.

Authorizes the Secretaries of Agriculture and the Interior to make grants to carry out projects and activities under the program to: (1) assist in the prevention, forecasting, detection, and mitigation of avalanches; (2) maintain essential transportation and communications; (3) assist avalanche artillery users to ensure the availability of adequate supplies of artillery and other explosives required for avalanche control in or affecting NPS units, other federal land used for recreation, and adjacent communities, and essential transportation corridors; and (4) assist research and development activities for alternatives to minimize reliance on military weapons for avalanche control.

Authorizes appropriations.