There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006

Short Titles as Introduced

National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to temporarily increase the borrowing authority of the Federal Emergency Management Agency for carrying out the national flood insurance program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/23/2006Became Public Law No: 109-208. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2006Signed by President.
03/17/2006Presented to President.
03/16/2006Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2388; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2388)
02/15/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H290)
02/10/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1075; text as passed Senate: CR S1075)
02/10/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
03/23/2006Became Public Law No: 109-208. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2006Signed by President.
03/17/2006SenatePresented to President.
03/17/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/16/2006SenateSenate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2388; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2388)
02/15/2006SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
02/15/2006-11:28amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/15/2006-11:28amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H290)
02/15/2006-11:06amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2275.
02/15/2006-11:06amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H290-293)
02/15/2006-11:05amHouseMr. Ney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/14/2006-6:21pmHouseHeld at the desk.
02/14/2006-2:12pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/13/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/10/2006SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1075; text as passed Senate: CR S1075)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 11/13/2019 text has not been received for S.2275 - National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-208 (03/23/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on February 15, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

National Flood Insurance Program Enhanced Borrowing Authority Act of 2006 - Amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to increase from $18.5 billion to $20.775 billion, through FY2008, the total amount which the Director of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) may borrow from the Secretary of the Treasury with the President's approval to carry out the flood insurance program.

Designates such funds as emergency spending.