There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Albuquerque Biological Park Title Clarification Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Albuquerque Biological Park Title Clarification Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Albuquerque Biological Park Title Clarification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Albuquerque Biological Park Title Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to clear title to certain real property in New Mexico associated with the Middle Rio Grande Project, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/2005Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-311.
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9026)
03/07/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-18.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/18/2005HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 169.
11/18/2005HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-311.
10/19/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/19/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/19/2005HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
08/01/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9026)
03/07/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
03/07/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-18.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S742-743)
02/01/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S742)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/01/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/07/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-18
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
10/19/2005 Markup by
11/18/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-311
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power08/01/2005 Referred to
10/19/2005 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (11/18/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Albuquerque Biological Park Title Clarification Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to issue a quitclaim deed conveying any right, title, and interest the United States may have in and to Tingley Beach and San Gabriel Park in Albuquerque, New Mexico, to the City of Albuquerque. Provides that the City shall not be required to pay any additional costs for the value of such Park and Beach.