Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/15/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/15/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/15/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/15/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/07/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/30/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/30/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/24/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/26/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/02/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/05/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/22/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/26/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/05/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/05/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/12/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/05/2006