Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/16/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/16/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/16/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/14/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/14/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/28/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/28/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/28/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/31/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/27/2006