There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Wallowa Lake Dam Rehabilitation and Water Management Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Wallowa Lake Dam Rehabilitation and Water Management Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Wallowa Lake Dam Rehabilitation and Water Management Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Bureau of Reclamation to participate in the rehabilitation of the Wallowa Lake Dam in Oregon, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9033)
03/10/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-30.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9033)
03/10/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 43.
03/10/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-30.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/01/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/10/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-30
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power08/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Wallowa Lake Dam Rehabilitation and Water Management Act of 2005 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Commissioner of Reclamation, to provide grants to, or enter into cooperative or other agreements with, tribal, state, and local governmental entities and the Associated Ditch Companies, Incorporated (ADC) (nonprofit corporation that operates the Wallowa Lake Dam) to plan, design, and construct facilities needed to implement the Wallowa Lake Dam Rehabilitation Program and Phase II (fish passage improvements and water conservation measures) and Phase III (implementation of water exchange infrastructure) of the Wallowa Valley Water Management Plan.

Directs the Secretary, as a condition of providing funds, to ensure that: (1) the Rehabilitation Program meets the standards of the dam safety program of Oregon; (2) ADC agrees to assume liability for any work performed or supervised with funds provided to it under this Act; and (3) the United States shall not be liable for damages arising out of any act relating to a facility rehabilitated or constructed under this Act.

Limits the federal share of the cost of activities authorized under this Act to 80%.

Prohibits the federal government from holding title to, or being responsible for the operation and maintenance of, any facility rehabilitated or constructed under this Act. Permits only the Nez Perce Tribe to own and operate any facility constructed using federal funds authorized by this Act located at the Dam for trapping and transportation of migratory adult salmon.