There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Reclamation, to assist in the implementation of fish passage and screening facilities at non-Federal water projects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9033-9034)
03/10/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-31.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9033-9034)
03/10/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44.
03/10/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-31.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/10/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-31
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power08/02/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans08/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.232.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.232. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Commissioner of the Bureau of Reclamation, directly or through financial assistance to non-federal parties, to plan, design, and construct fish passage and screening facilities or habitat improvements at any non-federal water diversion or storage project located anywhere in the Columbia River Basin. Provides such authority when the Secretary determines that such facilities would enable the Bureau to meet its obligations for the construction, operation, and maintenance of federal reclamation projects in the Columbia River Basin, excluding the projects located in the Snake River Basin. Limits the federal share to 75% of project costs.

Authorizes the Secretary to assist a non-federal party who owns, operates, or maintains a non-federal water diversion or storage project and associated lands to obtain and comply with any required state, local, or tribal permits. Makes the Secretary subject to all federal laws applicable to activities associated with the construction of a fish passage and screening facility or habitat improvements. Directs the Secretary to: (1) comply with any applicable state water laws; and (2) coordinate with the Northwest Power and Conservation Council, appropriate agencies of the states of Idaho, Oregon, and Washington, and appropriate federally recognized Indian tribes in carrying out the program authorized by this Act.

Makes the Reclamation Act of 1902 and other federal reclamation laws inapplicable to the non-federal water projects at which the fish passage and screening facilities authorized by this Act are located and the lands such projects irrigate. Declares that expenditures made by the Secretary under this Act shall not be a project cost assignable to any federal reclamation project and shall be non-reimbursable and non-returnable to the Treasury.