There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to make available funds included in the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 for the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program for fiscal year 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-204. (TXT | PDF)
03/20/2006Signed by President.
03/17/2006Presented to President.
03/16/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 287 - 128 (Roll no. 66).(text: CR 3/15/2006 H1047-1048)
03/07/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S1828)
02/16/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (41)

Date Chamber
03/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-204. (TXT | PDF)
03/20/2006Signed by President.
03/17/2006SenatePresented to President.
03/16/2006-6:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/2006-6:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 287 - 128 (Roll no. 66). (text: CR 3/15/2006 H1047-1048)
03/16/2006-6:15pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1118-1119)
03/15/2006-10:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/15/2006-10:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2320.
03/15/2006-10:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1047-1051)
03/15/2006-10:34pmHouseMr. Barton (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/07/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/07/2006-7:40pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/07/2006SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S1828)
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2898 Ruled non-germane by the chair.
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2898 Point of order raised in Senate with respect to amendment SA 2898.
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2899 Amendment SA 2899 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2913 Amendment SA 2913 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay. 68 - 31. Record Vote Number: 34.
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2913 Amendment SA 2913 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Snowe to Amendment SA 2899. (consideration: CR S1815, S1826; text: CR S1815) To improve the distribution of funds to States under there Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program.
03/07/2006SenateCloture on the bill invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 75 - 25. Record Vote Number: 33. (consideration: CR S1815; text: CR S1815)
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2898 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1808, S1826)
03/07/2006SenateS.Amdt.2899 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1808, S1826)
03/07/2006SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1808-1815, S1817-1828)
03/06/2006SenateS.Amdt.2898 Amendment SA 2898 proposed by Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S1778-1780) To reduce energy prices.
03/06/2006SenateS.Amdt.2899 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1778)
03/06/2006SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1778-1780)
03/03/2006SenateCloture motion on the bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S1665-1666; text: CR S1666)
03/03/2006SenateS.Amdt.2899 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1665)
03/03/2006SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1665-1677)
03/02/2006SenateS.Amdt.2899 Amendment SA 2899 proposed by Senator Kyl. (consideration: CR S1636-1638; text: CR S1636) To make available funds included in the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 for allotments to States for the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program for fiscal year 2006.
03/02/2006SenateMotion to waive the Budget Act with respect to the measure agreed in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 31. Record Vote Number: 30.
03/02/2006SenatePoint of order against the measure raised in Senate.
03/02/2006SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1632-1638)
03/02/2006SenateCloture motion withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate.
02/28/2006SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S1522)
02/28/2006SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S1522; text: CR S1522)
02/28/2006SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1522)
02/17/2006SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363.
02/16/2006SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/16/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/28/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/28/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/02/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/02/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/07/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/07/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2320. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-204 (03/20/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on March 7, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 to: (1) advance from FY2007 to FY2006 the fiscal year for which funds are appropriated for the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP); (2) increase from $250 million (for FY2007) to $500 million for FY2006 the funding for LIHEAP allotments to states, insular areas, and Indian tribes, and for energy crisis intervention; (3) reduce from $750 million (for FY2007) to $500 million for FY2006 the funding for the allotment of emergency funds; and (4) repeal the limitation on such funds as a one-time only obligation and expenditure.

Bars use of the funds for certain state planning and administration purposes.

Accelerates the termination of such appropriation and related allocations and conditions from September 30, 2007, to September 30, 2006.