Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/17/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/17/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/27/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/28/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/28/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/07/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/07/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/09/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/13/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/16/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/16/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/16/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/27/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/27/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/27/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/27/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/30/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/04/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/24/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/24/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/24/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/25/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/25/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/26/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/26/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/26/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/27/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/27/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/27/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/01/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/09/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/09/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/09/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/15/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/15/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/15/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/17/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/17/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/18/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/18/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/22/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/23/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/24/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/25/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/05/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/05/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/05/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/12/2006