Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/28/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/26/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/03/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/21/2006