Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/08/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/08/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/09/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 03/13/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/15/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/27/2006