Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/02/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/03/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/03/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/03/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/03/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/03/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/09/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/09/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 02/18/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/18/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/18/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/01/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/01/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/01/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/01/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/10/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/10/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/04/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/04/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/04/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/04/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/05/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/06/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/11/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/12/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/12/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/19/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/11/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/11/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/17/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/09/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/15/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/22/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/29/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/03/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/05/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/07/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 10/18/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/15/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/01/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/06/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/14/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/28/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/08/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/18/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/05/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/25/2006