Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/24/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/24/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/24/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/24/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/08/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/08/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/08/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/13/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/13/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/19/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/19/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/10/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/18/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/26/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/26/2006