There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 2006

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Revision Act of 2006

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Revision Act of 2006

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Revision Act of 2006

Short Titles as Introduced

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Revision Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to revise a provision relating to a repayment obligation of the Fort McDowell Yavapai Nation under the Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 1990, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/27/2006Became Public Law No: 109-373. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006Presented to President.
09/28/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7735-7736)
09/13/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9564)
07/19/2006Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 109-284.
03/28/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
11/27/2006Became Public Law No: 109-373. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006SenatePresented to President.
09/28/2006-3:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2006-3:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7735-7736)
09/28/2006-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2464.
09/28/2006-3:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7735-7736)
09/28/2006-3:09pmHouseMr. Hayworth moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/18/2006HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
09/14/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/14/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/14/2006-10:25amHouseReceived in the House.
09/13/2006SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9564)
09/13/2006SenateS.Amdt.5006 Amendment SA 5006 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/13/2006SenateS.Amdt.5006 Amendment SA 5006 proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator McCain. (consideration: CR S9564; text: CR S9564) To make a technical correction.
09/13/2006SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9564)
07/19/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522.
07/19/2006SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 109-284.
06/22/2006SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/28/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2471-2472)
03/28/2006SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2471)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/28/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/28/2006 Referred to
06/22/2006 Markup by
07/19/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-284
House Resources09/14/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-373 (11/27/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed in the Senate on September 13, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Revision Act of 2006 - Cancels the obligation of the Fort McDowell Yavapai Nation to repay the loan, under the Fort McDowell Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 1990, for the construction of water conveyance and delivery facilities on the Fort McDowell Indian Reservation.