Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/28/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/28/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/31/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/05/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/23/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/24/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/24/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/07/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/07/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/08/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/12/2006