Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/31/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/31/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/31/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/31/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/31/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/25/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/05/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/27/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/13/2006