Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/26/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/10/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/10/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/15/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/17/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/17/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/25/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/25/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/25/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/06/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/13/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/21/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/22/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/22/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/22/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/22/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/22/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/26/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/11/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/13/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/14/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/17/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/18/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/19/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/24/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/25/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/25/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/27/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/28/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/01/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/02/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/06/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/06/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/06/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/06/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/12/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/12/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/12/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/14/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/14/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/14/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/14/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/14/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/18/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/18/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/18/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/18/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/18/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/18/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/20/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/20/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/20/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/21/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/21/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/25/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/25/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/25/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/25/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/25/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/25/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/26/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/26/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/26/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/26/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/27/2006