There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Dandini Research Park Conveyance Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Dandini Research Park Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Dandini Research Park Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Dandini Research Park Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain land in Washoe County, Nevada, to the Board of Regents of the University and Community College System of Nevada.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2005Became Public Law No: 109-69. (TXT | PDF)
09/21/2005Signed by President.
09/14/2005Presented to President.
09/13/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7827)
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9039)
03/14/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-38.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/21/2005Became Public Law No: 109-69. (TXT | PDF)
09/21/2005Signed by President.
09/14/2005SenatePresented to President.
09/13/2005-2:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2005-2:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7827)
09/13/2005-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 252.
09/13/2005-2:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7827-7828)
09/13/2005-2:36pmHouseMr. Gibbons moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9039)
03/14/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 53.
03/14/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-38.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S766-767)
02/01/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S766)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/01/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/14/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-38
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-69 (09/21/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Dandini Research Park Conveyance Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the Board of Regents of the University and Community College System of Nevada all right, title, and interest of the United States in specified land located in Washoe County, Nevada, patented to the University of Nevada under the Recreation and Public Purposes Act.

Requires the Board of Regents to pay to the United States the Secretary's costs associated with such conveyance.

Requires, if the Board of Regents sells any part of the conveyed land: (1) the amount of consideration for the sale to reflect fair market value, as determined by an appraisal; and (2) the Board of Regents to pay the net proceeds of any sale of such land to the Secretary for use by the Director of the Bureau of Land Management in Nevada, without further appropriation.