There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 Land Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain land to the land to the Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 in Pahrump, Nevada, for the construction of a post building and memorial park for use by the American Legion, other veterans' groups, and the local community.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9039-9040; text as passed Senate: CR S9040)
03/14/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with amendments. With written report No. 109-39.
02/01/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9039-9040; text as passed Senate: CR S9040)
03/14/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
03/14/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with amendments. With written report No. 109-39.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
02/01/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S767)
02/01/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S767)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/01/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/01/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/14/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-39
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.253.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 14, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 Land Conveyance Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the Edward H. McDaniel American Legion Post No. 22 in Pahrump, Nevada, specified federal lands in Nevada for the construction of a post building and memorial park for use by Post No. 22, other veterans groups, and the local community for events and activities.