Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/05/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/05/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 04/05/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/05/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/05/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/07/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/21/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/05/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/13/2006