There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2633 11th Street in Rock Island, Illinois, as the "Lane Evans Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/02/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8667-8668; text as passed Senate: CR S8667)
08/01/2006Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
04/05/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/06/2006-9:13pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/06/2006-2:20pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8667-8668; text as passed Senate: CR S8667)
08/01/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566.
08/01/2006SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
07/27/2006SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/05/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2915)
04/05/2006SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2915)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 04/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/05/2006 Referred to
07/27/2006 Markup by
08/01/2006 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2555. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (08/01/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2633 11th Street in Rock Island, Illinois, as the "Lane Evans Post Office Building."