Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/24/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/24/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/25/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/25/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/26/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/04/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/11/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/16/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/25/2006