Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/06/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/25/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/26/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/26/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/01/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/02/2006