Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/01/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/03/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/07/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/07/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/16/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/03/2005