Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/06/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/21/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/12/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/13/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/17/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/17/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/18/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/18/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/19/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/24/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/24/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/25/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/25/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/25/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/25/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/26/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/27/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/28/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/28/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/31/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/31/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/31/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 08/01/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 08/01/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/03/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/05/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/05/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/05/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/05/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/05/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/05/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/06/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/06/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/06/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/06/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/06/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/07/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/07/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/07/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/07/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/13/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/13/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/13/2006