Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/06/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/18/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/06/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/08/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/14/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2006