Committees: S.260 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works02/02/2005 Referred to
04/22/2005 Hearings by
06/08/2005 Markup by
06/22/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-86
House Resources06/28/2005 Referred to
06/21/2006 Markup by
07/13/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-562
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans06/30/2005 Referred to
09/23/2005 Hearings by
06/21/2006 Discharged from