Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/26/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/26/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/01/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/03/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/04/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 05/15/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/17/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/06/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/05/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/05/2006