Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/02/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/09/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/10/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/19/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2006