There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs Act

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Ambassador for ASEAN Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to establish the position of the United States Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the position of the United States Ambassador for ASEAN.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/07/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9214-9215; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9214; text as passed Senate: CR S9214-9215)
05/25/2006Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Lugar with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/02/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/08/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
09/08/2006-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/08/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/07/2006SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9214-9215; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9214; text as passed Senate: CR S9214-9215)
05/25/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
05/25/2006SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Lugar with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/23/2006SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/02/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/02/2006SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3900)

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/02/2006 Referred to
05/23/2006 Markup by
05/25/2006 Reported by
House International Relations09/08/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2697.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2697. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/07/2006)

United States Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs Act - Establishes in the Department of State the position of U.S. Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs (Association of Southeast Asian Nations).

Expresses the sense of Congress that a Deputy Assistant Secretary of State for East Asia and the Pacific should be designated as the Ambassador for ASEAN Affairs.