Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/04/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/04/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/04/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/05/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/05/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/05/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/05/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/08/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/08/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/08/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/09/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/09/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/09/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/12/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/15/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/16/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/16/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/18/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/18/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/19/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/25/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/15/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/15/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/21/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/27/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/13/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/13/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/13/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/18/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/18/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/19/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 07/19/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/19/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/19/2006