Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/03/2006
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/07/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/12/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/25/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/27/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/12/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/14/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/14/2006