There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Caribbean National Forest Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Caribbean National Forest Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Caribbean National Forest Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to designate certain National Forest System land in the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate certain National Forest System land in the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9035; text as passed Senate: CR S9035)
03/10/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-34.
02/03/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/27/2005-8:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9035; text as passed Senate: CR S9035)
03/10/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 47.
03/10/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-34.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
02/03/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S980)
02/03/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S980)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/03/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/03/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/10/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-34

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.272. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 10, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Caribbean National Forest Act of 2005 - Designates the El Toro Wilderness in the Caribbean National Forest/Luquillo Experimental Forest in the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Prohibits anything in this Act from precluding the installation and maintenance of hydrologic, meteorological, climatological, or atmospheric data collection and remote transmission facilities that are essential to the scientific research purposes of the Luquillo Experimental Forest.