There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Wind Cave National Park Boundary Revision Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Wind Cave National Park Boundary Revision Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Wind Cave National Park Boundary Revision Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Wind Cave National Park Boundary Revision Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to revise the boundary of the Wind Cave National Park in the State of South Dakota.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
09/21/2005Became Public Law No: 109-71. (TXT | PDF)
09/21/2005Signed by President.
09/15/2005Presented to President.
09/13/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 106 (Roll no. 467).(text: CR H7829-7830)
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9027)
03/08/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-21.
02/03/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
09/21/2005Became Public Law No: 109-71. (TXT | PDF)
09/21/2005Signed by President.
09/15/2005SenatePresented to President.
09/13/2005-7:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2005-7:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 106 (Roll no. 467). (text: CR H7829-7830)
09/13/2005-7:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7834)
09/13/2005-2:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/13/2005-2:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 276.
09/13/2005-2:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7829-7830)
09/13/2005-2:48pmHouseMr. Fortuno moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9027)
03/08/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32.
03/08/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-21.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/03/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S982)
02/03/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S982)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/03/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/03/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/08/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-21
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-71 (09/21/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Wind Cave National Park Boundary Revision Act of 2005 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to acquire specified land or interests for addition to the Wind Cave National Park in South Dakota. Requires the Park's boundaries to be adjusted to reflect the acquisition of land.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) administer acquired land as part of the Park; and (2) transfer administrative jurisdiction over the land from the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to the Director of the National Park Service.

Authorizes the Secretary to: (1) allow the continuation of livestock grazing on such acquired land at the level existing on the date on which it is acquired; and (2) purchase the outstanding portion of, or accept the voluntary termination of, a grazing permit or lease on such land.