Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/11/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/12/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/08/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/25/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/25/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/25/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/03/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/03/2006