There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Enrollment Fairness Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend the annual, coordinated election period under the Medicare part D prescription drug program through all of 2006 and to provide for a refund of excess premiums paid during 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/16/2006Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/16/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/19/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/19/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/22/2006
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/23/2006 05/25/2006 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/16/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/16/2006)

Medicare Enrollment Fairness Act of 2006 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend the annual, coordinated election period, without any late enrollment penalty, for an additional seven months until the end of calendar 2006 for enrollments in Medicare Advantage plans and in the Medicare prescription drug benefit.

Permits a one-time change of plan enrollment for the Medicare prescription drug benefit during all of 2006 (currently, only during the first six months of 2006).

Makes appropriations to the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award health insurance information, counseling, and assistance grants to states under the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1990.